VA SB1140 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local fiscal impact bills; first day introduction. Requires bills that require a net reduction of revenues by local governments to be introduced no later than the first day of the regular session of the General Assembly.
Title
Local fiscal impact bills; first day introduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Tabled in Rules by voice vote |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1140S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104907D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104907D-S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102531D |