VA SB114 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Comprehensive animal care; enforceable under Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Subjects certain animal care statutes to enforcement under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act (§ 59.1-196 et seq.). These statutes relate to the posting of information about dogs and to written notice of consumer remedies required to be provided by pet shops, pet dealers, and animal boarding establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive animal care; enforceable under Virginia Consumer Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
2020-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB114ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
2020-03-02HousePassed House (62-Y 37-N)
2020-03-02HouseRead third time
2020-02-28HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB114S1
2020-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105940D-S1
2020-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-24SenateRead second time
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105940D-S1
2020-01-21SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-12-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100932D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326509(n/a)See Bill Text
326513.1(n/a)See Bill Text
326514(n/a)See Bill Text
326515(n/a)See Bill Text
326519(n/a)See Bill Text
591200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB114&201+sum+SB114
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB114+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB114S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB114ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0412+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0012+SB0114
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0135SB0114+SB0114
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0168SB0114+SB0114
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0101V0032+SB0114
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0257+SB0114
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1706+SB0114

Bill Comments

feedback