VA SB1138 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Sexually transmitted infections; infected sexual battery. Provides that any person who is diagnosed with a sexually transmitted infection and engages in sexual behavior that poses a substantial risk of transmission to another person according to current Centers for Disease Control and Prevention recommendations regarding such risk of transmission with the intent to transmit the infection to another person and transmits such infection to that person is guilty of infected sexual battery, punishable as Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, the crime of infected battery is punishable as a Class 6 felony. The bill also repeals the crime of donating or selling blood, body fluids, organs, and tissues by persons infected with human immunodeficiency virus and the provisions regarding the testing of certain persons for human immunodeficiency virus or hepatitis B or C viruses. The bill contains technical amendments. Sexually transmitted infections; infected sexual battery. Provides that any person who is diagnosed with a sexually transmitted infection and engages in sexual behavior that poses a substantial risk of transmission to another person according to current Centers for Disease Control and Prevention recommendations regarding such risk of transmission with the intent to transmit the infection to another person and transmits such infection to that person is guilty of infected sexual battery, punishable as Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, the crime of infected battery is punishable as a Class 6 felony. The bill also repeals the crime of donating or selling blood, body fluids, organs, and tissues by persons infected with human immunodeficiency virus and the provisions regarding the testing of certain persons for human immunodeficiency virus or hepatitis B or C viruses. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually transmitted infections; infected sexual battery, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator McCLellan reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1138S1
2021-02-05SenateSubstitute by Senator McCLellan agreed to 21104447D-S1
2021-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-05SenateAmendment by Senator McCLellan rejected
2021-02-05SenateAmendment by Senator McCLellan reconsidered (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateFloor substitute printed 21104447D-S1 (McClellan)
2021-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101066D-E
2021-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1138E
2021-02-02SenateAmendment by Senator McClellan agreed to
2021-02-02SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-02SenateRead second time
2021-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Judiciary (7-Y 5-N 2-A)
2021-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-03SenateIntroduced bill reprinted 21101066D
2021-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101066D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.55(n/a)See Bill Text
171805(n/a)See Bill Text
182346.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18252.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18262(n/a)See Bill Text
18267.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192299(n/a)See Bill Text
192310.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.02(n/a)See Bill Text
1928(n/a)See Bill Text
321289.2(n/a)See Bill Text
321291.16(n/a)See Bill Text
5412982(n/a)See Bill Text
5412983(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1138
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1138+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1138E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1138S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104322A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1138AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1138ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1138F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1138FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0075+SB1138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0184SB1138+SB1138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0326SB1138+SB1138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0327SB1138+SB1138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0328SB1138+SB1138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0378SB1138+SB1138

Bill Comments

feedback