VA SB1136 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1136
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; removal. Repeals the authorizations for issuance of special license plates no longer issued due to low plate sales, expired authorizations, or inability to issue. In addition, the bill directs the revenue shared for previous issuances and renewals and future renewals of Kids Eat Free special license plates to the Division of Community Nutrition at the Virginia Department of Health. Special license plates; removal. Repeals the authorizations for issuance of special license plates no longer issued due to low plate sales, expired authorizations, or inability to issue. In addition, the bill directs the revenue shared for previous issuances and renewals and future renewals of Kids Eat Free special license plates to the Division of Community Nutrition at the Virginia Department of Health.
Title
License plates, special; repeals issuance of certain plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 269 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1136ER) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21100620D-E |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1136E |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Marsden agreed to |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100620D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1136 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1063 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 746.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 746.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 746.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 747 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 748 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 749.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 749.69:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |