VA SB1136 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Commission on Administrative Rules; powers and duties; effect of administrative rules on private sector employment. Adds to the powers and duties of the Joint Commission on Administrative Rules the power to review proposed rules and regulations of any agency during the promulgation or final adoption process and determine whether or not a rule or regulation will cause a substantial reduction in private sector employment. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Administrative Rules, Joint Commission on; powers and duties, effect of administrative rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337) | |
2015-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1136ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102522D |