VA SB1134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Refunding bonds; emergency. Alters the principal and interest requirements, maturity date, and allowable discount for previously issued refunding bonds. The bill contains an emergency clause and an expiration date of June 30, 2023.
Title
Refunding bonds; alters the principal and interest requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-07 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102179D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Carry Over) 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote