VA SB1133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Children's Services Act; eligibility for state pool of Children's Services Act; eligibility for state pool of funds; pilot program related to educational placement transition for certain students with disabilities. Expands eligibility for use of the state pool of funds under the Children's Services Act to services that are provided in a public school setting and requires that private day schools be approved and licensed by the Department of Education or an equivalent out-of-state licensing agency to be eligible for the state pool of funds. The bill requires the Department of Education and relevant local school boards to develop and implement a pilot program for up to four years in two to eight local school divisions in the Commonwealth. In developing the pilot, the Department is required to partner with the appropriate school board employees in each such local school division to (i) identify the resources, services, and supports required by each student who resides in each such local school division and who is educated in a private school setting pursuant to his Individualized Education Program; (ii) study the feasibility of transitioning each such student from his private school setting to an appropriate public school setting in the local school division and providing the identified resources, services, and supports in such public school setting; and (iii) recommend a process for redirecting federal, state, and local funds, including funds provided pursuant to the Children's Services Act, provided for the education of each such student to the local school division for the purpose of providing the identified resources, services, and supports in the appropriate public school setting. The bill requires the Department of Education to make a report to the Governor, the Senate Committees on Education and Health and Finance and Appropriations, and the House Committees on Education and Appropriations on the findings of each pilot program after two and four years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Services Act; eligibility for state pool of funds, pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03SenatePassed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103477D-S1
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
2021-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-12-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-12-31SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102014D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225211(n/a)See Bill Text
225212(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback