VA SB1132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reproductive health services. Requires health benefit plans to cover the costs of specified health care services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures related to reproductive health, including (i) contraception and women's preventive health services identified by the Health Resources and Services Administration of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services or the women's preventive services initiative as of January 1, 2017; (ii) screening to determine whether counseling and testing related to the BRCA1 or BRCA2 genetic mutations is indicated and testing and genetic counseling related to the BRCA1 or BRCA2 genetic mutations if indicated; (iii) abortion to the extent permitted by applicable law; and (d) voluntary sterilization. The health benefit plan requirements become effective when a plan is delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended in the Commonwealth on and after January 1, 2020, or at any time thereafter when any term of the health benefit plan is changed or any premium adjustment is made. The measure also requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance services a provision for the payment of the costs of a reproductive health care program providing reimbursement for medically necessary reproductive health care services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures for eligible individuals.
Title
Reproductive health services; health benefit plans to cover costs of specified health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 10-N) (Y: 4 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 19104355D-S1 |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102426D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |