VA SB1130 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Institutions of higher education; Get Skilled, Get a Job, Get Ahead Program. Directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to convene a work group, consisting of the Director of the Council or his designee, the Director of the Virginia Office of Education Economics, the Director of Transfer of the Virginia Community College System, the Chancellor of the System, the Deputy Secretary of Higher Education, the Deputy Secretary of Labor, the Chair of the Virginia Board of Workforce Development, three presidents of community colleges in the Commonwealth or their designees, three presidents of baccalaureate public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth or their designees, and the Chairs of the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Education and Health, the Senate Subcommittee on Higher Education, and the House Subcommittee on Higher Education, for the purpose of making recommendations on and developing a plan for expanding the Get Skills, Get a Job, Get Ahead (G3) Program. The bill requires the work group to submit a report on its recommendations and plan for the expansion of the G3 Program to the Chairs of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by October 1, 2024. Institutions of higher education; Get Skilled, Get a Job, Get Ahead Program. Directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to convene a work group, consisting of the Director of the Council or his designee, the Director of the Virginia Office of Education Economics, the Director of Transfer of the Virginia Community College System, the Chancellor of the System, the Deputy Secretary of Higher Education, the Deputy Secretary of Labor, the Chair of the Virginia Board of Workforce Development, three presidents of community colleges in the Commonwealth or their designees, three presidents of baccalaureate public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth or their designees, and the Chairs of the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Education and Health, the Senate Subcommittee on Higher Education, and the House Subcommittee on Higher Education, for the purpose of making recommendations on and developing a plan for expanding the Get Skills, Get a Job, Get Ahead (G3) Program. The bill requires the work group to submit a report on its recommendations and plan for the expansion of the G3 Program to the Chairs of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by October 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Get Skilled, Get a Job, Get Ahead Program; SCHEV to convene workgroup to develop plan for expanding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseLeft in Education
2023-02-13HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N)
2023-02-10HouseAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-03SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1130S2
2023-02-03SenateFinance and Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 23106065D-S2
2023-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-03SenateEducation and Health Committee substitute rejected 23105155D-S1
2023-02-03SenateRead second time
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106065D-S2
2023-01-26SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105155D-S1
2023-01-26SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102479D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2312911.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1130
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1130+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1130S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1130S2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105155D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106065D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1130FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1130FS2122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S04V0101+SB1130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0181+SB1130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0212SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0236SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0237SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0902V0032+SB1130

Bill Comments

feedback