VA SB1129 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans service organizations; paramilitary activities. Exempts a member of a lawfully recognized military color guard, honor guard, or similar organization, or a member of a veterans service organization that is Congressionally chartered or officially recognized by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, when such member is participating in a public ceremony on behalf of such color guard, honor guard, or similar organization or such veterans service organization from the crimes of brandishing a firearm and unlawful paramilitary activity. Veterans service organizations; paramilitary activities. Exempts a member of a lawfully recognized military color guard, honor guard, or similar organization, or a member of a veterans service organization that is Congressionally chartered or officially recognized by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, when such member is participating in a public ceremony on behalf of such color guard, honor guard, or similar organization or such veterans service organization from the crimes of brandishing a firearm and unlawful paramilitary activity.
Title
Military honor guards and veterans service organizations; paramilitary activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1129S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103361D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103361D-S1 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100955D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1129 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote