VA SB1129 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public procurement; requirements for use of construction management and design-build procurement methods. Establishes requirements for the procurement of construction using the construction management and design-build procurement methods by state and local public bodies and covered institutions of higher education, as defined in the bill, and the conditions under which such methods may be used. Public bodies must comply with procedures adopted by the Secretary of Administration for construction management or design-build projects. State public bodies and covered institutions must adopt procedures that include, among other things, a requirement that the state public body or covered institution make a written determination in advance that competitive sealed bidding is not practicable or fiscally advantageous and document the basis for the determination to use the construction management or design-build procurement method. The bill requires the Department of General Services (DGS) to evaluate the proposed procurement method of state public bodies and covered institutions and provide a recommendation regarding the procurement method within five days of receipt of the written determination. If a state public body or covered institution elects to proceed with the project using a construction management or design-build contract despite a DGS recommendation to the contrary, the state public body or covered institution must provide to DGS in writing its reasons for doing so. For local public bodies, construction management contracts may be used for projects whose cost is expected to be less than $10 million, provided that the project is a complex project and the project procurement method is approved by the local governing body. The bill also requires DGS to report to the Governor and certain General Assembly committees annually by December 1 information pertaining to (i) the agency's evaluation of projects submitted by state public bodies and covered institutions and (ii) all completed capital projects in excess of $2 million. This bill is identical to HB 2366.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; requirements for use of construction management contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 704 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1129ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 17105865D-S2 |
2017-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Albo, Jones, Torian |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Ruff, DeSteph, Surovell |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | House requested conference committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1129H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105414D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105414D-H1 |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1129S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104872D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104872D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102128D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Contracts
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Virginia Public Procurement Act
Contracts
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Virginia Public Procurement Act
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4308.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |