VA SB1128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Historical African American cemeteries; City of Hampton. Adds seven cemeteries in Hampton to the list of cemeteries for which qualified organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves. The cemeteries are Bassette's Cemetery, containing 212 eligible graves, Elmerton Cemetery, containing 339 eligible graves, Good Samaritan Cemetery, containing 37 eligible graves, Pleasant Shade Cemetery, containing 29 eligible graves, Queen Street Cemetery, containing 14 eligible graves, the Tucker Family Cemetery, containing 15 eligible graves, and Union Street Cemetery, containing 125 eligible graves. This bill is identical to HB 2681.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historical African American cemeteries; adds seven cemeteries in City of Hampton.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1128ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-15HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101064D-E
2019-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1128E
2019-01-24SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-24SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-14SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2018-12-29SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-12-29SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101064D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012211.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1128
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1128+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1128E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1128ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0268+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0018+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0074+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1128+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1128+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1128+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1128+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0088+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2841+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2853+SB1128
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0795SB1128+SB1128

Bill Comments

feedback