VA SB1128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; failure to respond to request for records; rebuttable presumption. Provides that there shall be a rebuttable presumption that a failure to respond to a request for records was willful and knowing.
Title
FOIA; failure to respond to request for records, rebuttable presumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2017-02-25 | Senate | No further action taken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102874D |