VA SB1127 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Housing and Community Development; protection of vulnerable tenants; report. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development, in coordination with the Department of Social Services, to convene a workgroup to evaluate policies that can be used to protect an authorized occupant where such authorized occupant is (i) a dependent child younger than 18 years of age or (ii) a mentally or physically incapacitated elderly person. The bill provides that the workgroup shall analyze the current protections in place for children and elderly tenants. The bill also directs the workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions by November 1, 2023. Department of Housing and Community Development; protection of vulnerable tenants; report. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development, in coordination with the Department of Social Services, to convene a workgroup to evaluate policies that can be used to protect an authorized occupant where such authorized occupant is (i) a dependent child younger than 18 years of age or (ii) a mentally or physically incapacitated elderly person. The bill provides that the workgroup shall analyze the current protections in place for children and elderly tenants. The bill also directs the workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions by November 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vulnerable tenants; DHCD, et al., to study and develop recommendations pertaining to evictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseLeft in General Laws
2023-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N)
2023-02-13HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1127S1
2023-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105688D-S1
2023-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-01-31SenateRead second time
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105688D-S1
2023-01-27SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2023-01-18SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103145D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511245.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1127
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1127+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1127S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105688D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1127F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1127FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S12V0032+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S09V0041+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0149SB1127+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0182SB1127+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1102V0040+SB1127

Bill Comments

feedback