VA SB1127 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable gaming; permit requirement; permissible locations; use of proceeds; suspensions and revocations. The bill modifies the list of organizations that may conduct charitable gaming and requires such organizations to obtain a permit from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; however, the bill exempts certain organizations from the permit application and audit fees. The bill removes provisions that allowed an organization to exclude from its gross receipts proceeds from instant bingo, pull tabs, seal cards, and Texas Hold'em. The bill specifies the locations at which an organization may conduct bingo, network bingo, instant bingo, pull tabs, or seal cards. The bill prohibits the holding of a permit by a supplier or manufacturer that commits certain violations or offenses after July 1, 2021. The bill prohibits the Charitable Gaming Board from adjusting the percentage of gross receipts that an organization must use for religious, charitable, community, or educational purposes or for certain real property expenses until a study is completed by a joint subcommittee created in the bill. Charitable gaming; permit requirement; permissible locations; use of proceeds; suspensions and revocations. The bill modifies the list of organizations that may conduct charitable gaming and requires such organizations to obtain a permit from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; however, the bill exempts certain organizations from the permit application and audit fees. The bill removes provisions that allowed an organization to exclude from its gross receipts proceeds from instant bingo, pull tabs, seal cards, and Texas Hold'em. The bill specifies the locations at which an organization may conduct bingo, network bingo, instant bingo, pull tabs, or seal cards. The bill prohibits the holding of a permit by a supplier or manufacturer that commits certain violations or offenses after July 1, 2021. The bill prohibits the Charitable Gaming Board from adjusting the percentage of gross receipts that an organization must use for religious, charitable, community, or educational purposes or for certain real property expenses until a study is completed by a joint subcommittee created in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable gaming; conduct of instant bingo, network bingo, pull tabs, and seal cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N 3-A) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (8-Y 1-N 6-A) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N 3-A)
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21104331D-ES2
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1127ES2
2021-02-04SenateAmendments by Senator Reeves agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104331D-S2
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21103702D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104331D-S2
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (8-Y 1-N 6-A)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103702D-S1
2020-12-23SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-12-23SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101186D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182340.28(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.28:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1127
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1127+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1127S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1127S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1127ES2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103702D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1127AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1127F122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0039+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0158+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1127+SB1127
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0332SB1127+SB1127

Bill Comments

feedback