VA SB1126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Lottery Board; regulation of casino gaming; penalties. Authorizes casino gaming in the Commonwealth to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery Board (the Board). Casino gaming shall be limited to certain cities that meet the criteria that is outlined in the bill, and a referendum must be passed in the city on the question of allowing casino gaming in the city. The bill requires the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to conduct a review of casino gaming laws in other states and report its findings to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the House Committee on General Laws on or before December 1, 2019. The bill contains enactment clauses that prohibit (i) any referendum from being held prior to the publication of the JLARC findings and recommendations regarding casino gaming or after January 1, 2021, and (ii) the Board from issuing a license to operate a gaming operation before July 1, 2020. The bill also provides that amendments to the Code of Virginia that are made in the bill will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery Board; regulation of casino gaming, penalties, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (64-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 27-N) (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 789 (effective - see bill)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1126ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (64-Y 33-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (64-Y 33-N)
2019-02-23HouseReconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 27-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (64-Y 27-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107709D-S3
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-13HouseDelegates: Peace, Gilbert, Jones, S.C., Plum
2019-02-13HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-13SenateSenators: Carrico, Lucas, Sturtevant
2019-02-13SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-13SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (67-Y 31-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (67-Y 31-N)
2019-02-13HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (80-Y 17-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1126H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106846D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106846D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
2019-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105946D-ES2
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1126ES2
2019-02-01SenateAmendment by Senator Norment agreed to
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105946D-S2
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19105340D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105946D-S2
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2019-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-21SenateIncorporates SB1706 (Lewis)
2019-01-21SenateIncorporates SB1503 (Carrico)
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105340D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A)
2018-12-28SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-12-28SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103689D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182334.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
372304(n/a)See Bill Text
372314.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5814002(n/a)See Bill Text
5814006(n/a)See Bill Text
5814100(n/a)See Bill Text
5814131(n/a)See Bill Text
591364(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1126
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126ES2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1126ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0789+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0037+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0191+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1126+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0325SB1126+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0140+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2760+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2763+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0602SB1126+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0619SB1126+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1108SB1126+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3359+SB1126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3361+SB1126

Bill Comments

feedback