VA SB1126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer finance companies; Internet loans. Provides that the laws regulating consumer finance companies apply to persons making loans to individuals for personal, family, household, or other nonbusiness purposes over the Internet to Virginia residents or any individuals in Virginia, whether or not the person making the loans maintains a physical presence in the Commonwealth. The measure has a reenactment clause and directs the Bureau of Financial Institutions to conduct an analysis of the legal, administrative, and other relevant issues relating to the feasibility of regulating Internet lending activities by consumer finance companies.
Title
Consumer finance companies; Internet loans, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17100949D-E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1126E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100949D |
Subjects
Computer Services and Uses
Financial Institutions and Services
Internet
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Financial Institutions and Services
Internet
Study Commissions Committees and Reports