VA SB1125 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (6-Y 15-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (6-Y 15-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; definition of "medical care facility." Adds to the list of medical care facilities for which a certificate of public need is required any facility that has common ownership with an affiliated licensed hospital located within 35 miles of the facility and that includes, as part of the facility, a dedicated emergency department as defined in 42 C.F.R. ?§489.24(b) that is subject to the requirements of the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act. The bill exempts proposed medical care facilities for which an application for a certificate of public need was received by the Department of Health by December 31, 2017, or for which any appeal of the issuance or denial of a certificate of public need was filed by December 31. 2017, and is currently pending from the provisions of the bill.
Title
Certificate of public need; definition of "medical care facility", projects filed on/before 12/2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (6-Y 15-N) (Y: 6 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (7-Y 4-N 4-A) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (7-Y 4-N 4-A) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (6-Y 15-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19101598D-E |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1125E |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (7-Y 4-N 4-A) |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101598D |