VA SB1125 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Accountancy; technical updates to conform with recently updated professional standards and requirements for out-of-state CPA firms. Clarifies that out-of-state certified public accountant (CPA) firms practicing in Virginia must adhere to the same requirements as CPA firms licensed in Virginia. The bill defines financial statement preparation services and adds such services to the current services that may be provided by out-of-state CPA firms.
Title
Accountancy, Board of; technical updates to conform with recently updated professional standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1125ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102676D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 4400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4412.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4413.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4413.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4413.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |