VA SB1124 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Administration of gross premium tax on insurance companies. Transfers the administration of the gross premiums on certain insurance companies from the State Corporation Commission to the Department of Taxation. Surplus lines brokers that fail to file required reports are subject to fines and penalties. Provisions regarding the tax on surplus lines insurance policies are effective July 1, 2011. Other provisions shall become effective for the taxable year on or after January 1, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gross premiums of certain insurance; administration of tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
2011-04-06 House: Enacted, Chapter 850 (effective - see bill)
2011-04-06 House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
2011-04-06 Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled
2011-04-06 Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1124ER2)
2011-04-06 Senate: Reenrolled
2011-04-06 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2011-04-06 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2011-04-06 House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2011-04-06 Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2011-04-05 Senate: Placed on Calendar
2011-03-26 Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1124ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-23 Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Engrossed by House as amended
2011-02-22 House: Amendments by Delegate Janis agreed to
2011-02-22 House: Read third time
2011-02-21 House: Read second time
2011-02-17 House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2011-02-08 House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2011-02-08 House: Read first time
2011-02-08 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-04 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2011-02-03 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1124S1
2011-02-03 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104534D-S1
2011-02-03 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2011-02-03 Senate: Read second time
2011-02-02 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104534D-S1
2011-01-31 Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2011-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2011-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103727D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SB1124
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1124+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1124S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1124ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1124ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0850+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S02V0062+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0194SB1124+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0223SB1124+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H14V0141+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1184+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0650SB1124+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0880SB1124+SB1124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1748+SB1124

Bill Comments

feedback