VA SB1122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits for retired state employees. Increases annually the amount of the health insurance credit for retirees who rendered at least 30 years of creditable service in the Virginia Retirement System. The bill increases the credit by the same percentage as any annual post-retirement supplement that is calculated for employees hired on or after July 1, 2010. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits for retired state employees, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19102865D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1122E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2018-12-26SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-26SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102865D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5111400(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback