VA SB1122 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Applicants for public assistance; contact information. Requires local departments of social services to collect from every applicant for public assistance alternative contact information, such as the applicant's email address and cell phone number, and the applicant's preferred method of contact, including direct mail, email, text message, or phone call. Under current law, local departments of social services are required to obtain only the applicant's best available address and telephone number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applicants for public assistance; contact information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
2017-03-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-23 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-23SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17
2017-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-22SenateSigned by President
2017-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1122ER)
2017-02-22SenateEnrolled
2017-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20HouseRead third time
2017-02-17HouseRead second time
2017-02-15HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2017-02-09HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-09HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-18SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102803D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632501.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1122
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1122+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1122ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0472+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S09V0017+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0018SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0049SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0182+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0206V0025+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0171+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2468+SB1122

Bill Comments 750

feedback