VA SB1122 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Deadman's Statute; corroboration of testimony by business records. Revises the Deadman's Statute by allowing for the corroboration of the testimony of an adverse or interested party by an entry in a business record authored by the adverse or interested party. If the authentication of the business record used as evidence for corroboration is not admitted in a request for admission, the record must be authenticated by a person who is not the author of the entry and who is not an adverse or interested party to the case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deadman's Statute; corroboration of testimony by business records, authentication of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
2013-03-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-20SenateSigned by President
2013-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1122ER)
2013-02-19SenateEnrolled
2013-02-14HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14HouseRead third time
2013-02-13HouseRead second time
2013-02-11HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-02-11HouseRead first time
2013-02-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-05SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2013-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 13100539D-E
2013-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1122E
2013-02-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2013-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2013-02-05SenateRead second time
2013-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-04SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
2013-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100539D

Same As/Similar To

HB1477 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801397(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+SB1122
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1122+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1122E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1122ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0637+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S03V0170+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0375SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0379SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0382SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H08V0336+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0896+SB1122

Bill Comments 750

feedback