VA SB112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; diploma requirements; dual enrollment and work-based learning options. Requires the Board of Education to include in its graduation requirements the options for students to complete a dual enrollment course or high-quality work-based learning experience.
Title
High school graduation; standard diploma requirements, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 580 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB112ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101058D |
Same As/Similar To
HB516 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)