VA SB1119 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine; continuity of care. Allows for continuity of care through telemedicine when a practitioner with whom a patient has previously established a practitioner-patient relationship is unavailable at the time in which the patient seeks continuity of care. The bill allows another practitioner of the same subspecialty at the same practice group with access to the patient's treatment history to provide continuity of care using telemedicine services until the practitioner with whom the patient has a previously established practitioner-patient relationship becomes available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine; practitioner-patient relationship, continuity of care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
2023-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-16SenateSigned by President
2023-02-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1119ER)
2023-02-16SenateEnrolled
2023-02-14HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HouseRead third time
2023-02-13HouseRead second time
2023-02-09HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-08HouseRead first time
2023-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1119S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105518D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105518D-S1
2023-02-02SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104213D

Same As/Similar To

HB1754 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
HB1754 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5413601(n/a)See Bill Text
5413701(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1119
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1119+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1119S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1119ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0151+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105518D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1119F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1119FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1119FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S04V0140+SB1119
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0241SB1119+SB1119
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0276SB1119+SB1119
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0277SB1119+SB1119
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0180+SB1119
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1781+SB1119

Bill Comments

feedback