VA SB1119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; definition of personal interest in a transaction. Amends the definition of personal interest in a transaction to clarify that such an interest does not exist when an officer, employee, or elected member of a separate local governmental agency formed by a local governing body is appointed to serve on a governmental agency and the personal interest in the transaction of the governmental agency is the result of the compensation or benefits provided by the separate local governmental agency to the officer, employee, elected member, or member of his immediate family.
Title
State & Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; definition of personal interest in transaction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 475 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1119ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101434D |