VA SB1118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; tuition and fee increases; public comment. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education, prior to a vote on an increase in undergraduate tuition or mandatory fees, to permit public comment on the proposed increase at a meeting of the governing board. The bill requires each such governing board to establish policies for such public comment, which may include reasonable time limitations. This bill is identical to HB 2173.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; tuition and fee increases, public comment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1118ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Miyares, Landes, Bulova
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Petersen, Norment, Newman
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-18HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1118H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106644D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106644D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1118S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105855D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105855D-S1
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1616 (Wagner)
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1546 (Sturtevant)
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1261 (Sturtevant)
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1239 (DeSteph)
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1204 (Stuart)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2018-12-26SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-12-26SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101648D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231307(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1118
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1118+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1118S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1118H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1118ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0584+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0130+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0227+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1118+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1118+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1118+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0127+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2679+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0672SB1118+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0805SB1118+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1047SB1118+SB1118
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3301+SB1118

Bill Comments

feedback