VA SB1117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (19-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance policies; bad faith. Provides that if an insurance company denies, refuses, or fails to pay its insured, or refuses a reasonable settlement demand within the policy's coverage limits for a claim for uninsured or underinsured motorist benefits within a reasonable time after being presented with a demand for such benefits and it is subsequently found that such denial, refusal, or failure was not in good faith, then the insurance company shall be liable to the insured for the full amount of the judgment and reasonable attorney fees, expenses, and interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance policies; bad faith.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HousePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (19-Y 3-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
2018-12-26SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-26SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100551D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822206(n/a)See Bill Text
80166.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback