VA SB1116 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain public school employees; assistance with student insulin pumps. Authorizes, but does not require, local school board employees who are registered nurses, licensed practical nurses, or certified nurse aides and who have been trained in the administration of insulin, including the use and insertion of insulin pumps, and the administration of glucagon to assist a student who is diagnosed with diabetes and who carries an insulin pump with the insertion or reinsertion of the pump or any of its parts, provided that assistance has been authorized by the prescriber and consented to by the student's parent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public school employees, certain; assistance with student insulin pumps by register nurse, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1116ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-20SenateSigned by President
2017-02-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-17SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1116ER)
2017-02-17SenateEnrolled
2017-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseRead third time
2017-02-14HouseRead second time
2017-02-13HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07HouseAssigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1116S1
2017-01-30SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17104465D-S1
2017-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-01-30SenateRead second time
2017-01-27SenateIncorporates SB1214 (Stuart)
2017-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 17104465D-S1
2017-01-26SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2017-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101656D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221274.1:01(n/a)See Bill Text
801225(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1116
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1116+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1116S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1116ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1116ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0811+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0075+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0173SB1116+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0201SB1116+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0901V0070+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H09V0169+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2319+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1097SB1116+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1099SB1116+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1100SB1116+SB1116
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2910+SB1116

Bill Comments

feedback