VA SB1113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Communicating threats of death or bodily injury to a person with intent to intimidate; penalty. Provides that any person 18 years of age or older who communicates a threat in writing to another to kill or to do serious bodily injury to any other person and makes such threat with the intent to (i) intimidate a civilian population at large; (ii) influence the conduct or activities of a government, including the government of the United States, a state, or a locality, through intimidation; or (iii) compel the emergency evacuation, or avoidance, of any place of assembly, any building or other structure, or any means of mass transportation is guilty of a Class 5 felony. The bill provides that any person younger than 18 years of age who commits such offense is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. Communicating threats of death or bodily injury to a person with intent to intimidate; penalty. Provides that any person 18 years of age or older who communicates a threat in writing to another to kill or to do serious bodily injury to any other person and makes such threat with the intent to (i) intimidate a civilian population at large; (ii) influence the conduct or activities of a government, including the government of the United States, a state, or a locality, through intimidation; or (iii) compel the emergency evacuation, or avoidance, of any place of assembly, any building or other structure, or any means of mass transportation is guilty of a Class 5 felony. The bill provides that any person younger than 18 years of age who commits such offense is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Communicating threats of death or bodily injury to a person with intent to intimidate; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1113S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104255D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104255D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N) |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101629D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1113 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote