VA SB1112 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for prescription contraceptives. Requires health insurance carriers to provide coverage, under any health insurance contract, policy, or plan that includes coverage for prescription drugs on an outpatient basis, for any prescribed contraceptive drug or contraceptive device. The bill prohibits a health insurance carrier from imposing upon any person receiving contraceptive benefits pursuant to the provisions of the bill any copayment, coinsurance payment, or fee, except in certain circumstances. The provisions of the bill apply to health insurance contracts, policies, or plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on and after January 1, 2024.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for prescription contraceptives, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned sub: Special Subcommittee #5 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103101D |