VA SB1112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; exemplary damages. Provides that for the purpose of awarding exemplary damages in an action for personal injury or death arising from the operation of a motor vehicle while under the influence, it shall be rebuttably presumed that the blood alcohol concentration of the defendant at the time of the incident causing injury or death was at least as high as the test result shown in a certificate of analysis for a blood or breath test, provided that the test was administered within three hours of the incident. In addition to other forms of proof, a party may submit a copy of a certificate of analysis for a blood or breath test administered pursuant to an arrest for driving under the influence, which shall be prima facie evidence of the facts contained therein.
Title
Driving under influence of alcohol; exemplary damages, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 636 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1112ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments (94-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1112 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1112S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104773D-S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104773D-S1 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 4-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101826D |