VA SB1110 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Property; duties of real estate settlement agents. Provides that the State Corporation Commission may share information collected from a settlement agent or agency regarding any errors and omissions or malpractice insurance policy or surety bond with any party to the real estate transaction in connection with the actions of such agent or agency arising out of a settlement. Property; duties of real estate settlement agents. Provides that the State Corporation Commission may share information collected from a settlement agent or agency regarding any errors and omissions or malpractice insurance policy or surety bond with any party to the real estate transaction in connection with the actions of such agent or agency arising out of a settlement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate settlement agents; duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-19SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101798D-E
2021-01-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1110E
2021-01-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-18SenateRead second time
2021-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-12-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-12-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101798D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511004(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback