VA SB1108 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

General district courts; jurisdictional limits. Increases from $25,000 to $50,000 the maximum civil jurisdictional limit of general district courts for civil actions for personal injury and wrongful death. The bill contains an emergency clause. General district courts; jurisdictional limits. Increases from $25,000 to $50,000 the maximum civil jurisdictional limit of general district courts for civil actions for personal injury and wrongful death. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General district courts; jurisdictional limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2021-01-29SenateEmergency clause added
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1108S2
2021-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103882D-S2
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21103157D-S1
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103882D-S2
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103157D-S1
2021-01-18SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2020-12-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-12-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100842D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16177(n/a)See Bill Text
462644.03(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback