VA SB1108 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; culinary walking tour permit. Creates a new permit that allows tour companies guiding individuals for compensation on a culinary walking tour to licensed on-premises retail establishments to collect as one fee from tour participants (i) the licensee's fee for the food and alcoholic beverages served as part of the tour and (ii) a fee for the culinary walking tour service. The bill requires the tour company to remit to the licensee any fee collected for the food and alcoholic beverages served as part of the tour. The bill provides that food cooked or prepared on the premises of such licensed on-premises retail establishments shall be served at each such establishment on the tour.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; creates walking tour permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 675 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1108ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title replaced 17105641D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute (84-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1108H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105641D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105641D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101003D |