VA SB1107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 21-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 21-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Release of balloons. Prohibits any person, with certain exceptions, from intentionally releasing or causing to be released any balloon into the atmosphere that (i) is inflated with a substance lighter than air and (ii) requires more than five minutes' contact with air or water to degrade. Currently, a person is prohibited from releasing 50 or more nonbiodegradable or nonphotodegradable balloons within a one-hour period. The bill retains the current civil penalty of $5 per prohibited balloon released; however, the proceeds generated from the civil penalty are set to be deposited into the Litter Control and Recycling Fund administered by the Department of Environmental Quality; currently, the proceeds are deposited into the Lifetime Hunting and Fishing Endowment Fund.
Title
Balloons; prohibits release into atmosphere.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 21-N 1-A) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 21-N 1-A) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103105D-E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1107E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103105D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1415.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1422.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 556.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |