VA SB1106 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1106
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public School Assistance Fund and Program created. Creates the Public School Assistance Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Education, for the purpose of providing grants to school boards to be used for the purposes of repairing or replacing the heating, ventilation, air conditioning, electrical, or plumbing systems or the roofs of public elementary and secondary school buildings in the local school division, including financing costs for such repairs and replacements. The bill permits any school board in the Commonwealth to apply for Program grants but requires the Department of Education to give priority in the awarding of grants to school boards that demonstrate the greatest need based on the condition of existing school building roofs and the ability to pay for the repair or replacement of such roofs. Public School Assistance Fund and Program created. Creates the Public School Assistance Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Education, for the purpose of providing grants to school boards to be used for the purposes of repairing or replacing the heating, ventilation, air conditioning, electrical, or plumbing systems or the roofs of public elementary and secondary school buildings in the local school division, including financing costs for such repairs and replacements. The bill permits any school board in the Commonwealth to apply for Program grants but requires the Department of Education to give priority in the awarding of grants to school boards that demonstrate the greatest need based on the condition of existing school building roofs and the ability to pay for the repair or replacement of such roofs.
Title
Public School Assistance Fund and Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103869D-ES1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1106ES1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McClellan agreed to |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103869D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103869D-S1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100839D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1106 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote