VA SB1105 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reports of registered voters and persons voting at elections. Requires the local electoral boards to direct the general registrars to investigate the list of registered voters whenever the number of registered voters in a county or city exceeds the population of persons age 18 years or older, based on the most recent population estimate of the Weldon Cooper Center for Public Service of the University of Virginia. The bill also requires the local electoral boards to direct the general registrars to investigate the list of persons voting at an election whenever the number of persons voting at any election in a county or city exceeds the number of persons registered to vote in that county or city. The Department of Elections is required to provide certain data to any general registrar conducting such an investigation for the registrar's use during the investigation. The local electoral boards are required to make reports of the findings to the State Board. These reports are public documents.
Title
Registered voters and persons voting; reports of persons voting at elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-24 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1105ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1105S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104536D-S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104536D-S1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102905D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 405.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |