VA SB1102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Congressional and legislative district boundaries; alignment with boundaries of counties and cities; review of a voter's registration. Provides that, for purposes of congressional, senate, and House of Delegates districts, if a boundary of such a district virtually coincides with the boundary between two or more localities, the boundary of the congressional district shall conform to the boundary between the localities that has been (i) agreed upon by those localities, (ii) adopted in ordinances by those localities, and (iii) reported by those localities to the United States Bureau of the Census. The bill requires the State Board of Elections to review any change of boundary to determine whether there is evidence that the change was made with fraudulent intent, and if it appears there was fraudulent intent, the Board refers the matter to a circuit court to approve or deny the change. If two or more localities sharing a boundary cannot agree on the true boundary line between them, the boundary shall be that which was in existence on April 1, 2011, and was reported by the United States Bureau of the Census in the 2010 Census reports provided pursuant to United States Public Law 94-171. The bill provides a process by which a voter who believes he has been incorrectly assigned to an election district or precinct may request and have his assignment reviewed by the general registrar and, if necessary, the governing body of the county or city.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional & legislative district boundaries; alignment with boundaries of counties & cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HousePassed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1102S1
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105257D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105257D-S1
2019-01-22SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-12-21SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-12-21SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101188D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242302.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242303.3(n/a)See Bill Text
242304.03(n/a)See Bill Text
242314(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback