VA SB1102 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; completed unattended death investigations; mandatory disclosure. Requires that records of completed unattended death investigations be released to the parent or spouse of the decedent or, if there is no living parent or spouse, to the most immediate family member of the decedent, provided the person is not a person of interest or a suspect. The bill also defines "unattended death" and "immediate family member."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA; records of completed unattended death investigations, definition, mandatory disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #1 agreed to (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
2017-04-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 828 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1102ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation to Amendments #2 and 3 (97-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (39-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (16-Y 24-N)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation #1 agreed to (37-Y 3-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (24-Y 16-N)
2017-04-05SenateChair votes No
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (20-Y 20-N)
2017-03-27SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1102ER)
2017-02-24SenateEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-16HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26SenatePrinted as engrossed 17100845D-E
2017-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1102E
2017-01-26SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-26SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-01-26SenateRead second time
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17SenateAssigned GL&T sub: #1
2017-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100845D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223706(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1102
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1102+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1102E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1102ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1102ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0828+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0036+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0122SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0147SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1102V0062+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0226+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2522+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1092SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1093SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1094SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1095SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1096SB1102+SB1102
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2909+SB1102

Bill Comments

feedback