VA SB1101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Office of the Attorney General; representation of members of the General Assembly for violations of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. Allows the Office of the Attorney General to represent a member of the General Assembly in any civil matter alleging that such member in his official capacity violated the Virginia Freedom of Information Act (?§2.2-3700 et seq.). This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney General, Office of the; representation of members of G.A. for violations of FOIA.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1101ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100756D-E
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1101E
2019-02-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-05SenateRead first time
2019-02-05SenateReported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2018-12-21SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-12-21SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100756D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22507(n/a)See Bill Text
22510(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1101
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1101+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1101E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1101ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0357+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S10V0019+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0267+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0450SB1101+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0451SB1101+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0449SB1101+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0204V0013+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0208+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3116+SB1101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0955SB1101+SB1101

Bill Comments

feedback