VA SB1100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 2, 2018 Special Session I Acts of Assembly.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment (P.139 Item 3-5.20#1s) reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment (P.139 Item 3-5.20#1s) reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Budget floor amendments agreed to available |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to (P.095 Item 362#3s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.142 Item 4-14#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.139 Item 3-5.20#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment (P.139 Item 3-5.20#1s) reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.139 Item 3-5.20#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.120 Item 449#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.099 Item 376#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to (P.098 Item 368#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.098 Item 368#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Howell agreed to (P.081 Item 312#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.081 Item 312#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.071 Item 307#11s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.057 Item 293#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.056 Item 292#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.032 Item 136#7s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to (P.030 Item 136#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.030 Item 136#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.020 Item 113#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to (P.018 Item 105#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.018 Item 105#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to (P.006 Item 49#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.006 Item 49#2s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to (P.050 Item 266#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Contested committee amendment rejected (P.050 Item 266#1s) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Uncontested Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Budget amendments available |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101505D |