VA SB1095 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Superintendent of Public Instruction and Commissioner of Social Services; early childhood care and education. Requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction and the Commissioner of Social Services to (i) convene a stakeholder group to consider the development of a statewide unified public-private system for early childhood care and education in the Commonwealth and (ii) collaborate to develop a uniform quality rating and improvement system with required participation by publicly funded early childhood care and education programs and voluntary participation by privately funded providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early childhood care and education; development of a statewide unified public-private system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseReported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1095S3
2019-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 19106231D-S3
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateFloor substitute printed 19106231D-S3 (Hanger)
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19105994D-S2
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19105234D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-31SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105994D-S2
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-01-17SenateIncorporates SB1313 (Dunnavant)
2019-01-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105234D-S1
2019-01-07SenateIntroduced bill reprinted 19102558D
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102558D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522292(n/a)See Bill Text
1522824(n/a)See Bill Text
152741(n/a)See Bill Text
152914(n/a)See Bill Text
182255.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:4(n/a)See Bill Text
182370.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182370.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.02(n/a)See Bill Text
221167(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.5(n/a)See Bill Text
2211(n/a)See Bill Text
22119(n/a)See Bill Text
221199.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221289.02(n/a)See Bill Text
221289.054(n/a)See Bill Text
221296.3(n/a)See Bill Text
221299.4(n/a)See Bill Text
462341.10(n/a)See Bill Text
462341.18:3(n/a)See Bill Text
462341.9(n/a)See Bill Text
511617(n/a)See Bill Text
5413005(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.4(n/a)See Bill Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
6321515(n/a)See Bill Text
6321700(n/a)See Bill Text
6321701(n/a)See Bill Text
6321701.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321702(n/a)See Bill Text
6321704(n/a)See Bill Text
6321704.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321708(n/a)See Bill Text
6321715(n/a)See Bill Text
6321716(n/a)See Bill Text
6321717(n/a)See Bill Text
6321720(n/a)See Bill Text
6321720.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321721(n/a)See Bill Text
6321721.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321722(n/a)See Bill Text
6321723(n/a)See Bill Text
6321724(n/a)See Bill Text
6321725(n/a)See Bill Text
6321727(n/a)See Bill Text
6321734(n/a)See Bill Text
6321738(n/a)See Bill Text
6321809(n/a)See Bill Text
6321809.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321810(n/a)See Bill Text
6321811(n/a)See Bill Text
6321812(n/a)See Bill Text
6321813(n/a)See Bill Text
6321815(n/a)See Bill Text
632207(n/a)See Bill Text
632215(n/a)See Bill Text
632603(n/a)See Bill Text
91914(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1095
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1095+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1095S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1095S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1095S3+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0061+SB1095
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0131+SB1095
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1095+SB1095
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1095+SB1095
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0356SB1095+SB1095
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0901V0037+SB1095
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0137+SB1095

Bill Comments

feedback