VA SB1091 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Driver's license; marijuana possession. Revises the existing provision that a person loses his driver's license for six months when convicted of or placed on deferred disposition for a drug offense to provide that the provision does not apply to deferred disposition of simple possession of marijuana. The exception applies only to adults; juveniles will still be subject to license suspension. The bill provides that a court retains the discretion to suspend or revoke the driver's license of a person placed on deferred disposition for simple possession of marijuana and must suspend or revoke for six months the driver's license of such person who was operating a motor vehicle at the time of the offense. The bill also requires that such a person whose driver's license is not suspended or revoked perform 50 hours of community service in addition to any community service ordered as part of the deferred disposition. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon written assurance from the U.S. Department of Transportation that Virginia will not lose any federal funds as a result of implementation of the bill. This bill is identical to HB 2051.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana offenses; driver's license forfeiture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
2017-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 703 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1091ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference substitute printed 17105845D-S1
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Stanley, Ebbin, McDougle
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Adams, Gilbert, Watts
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-23HouseHouse requested conference committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2017-02-23SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1091H1
2017-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105514D-H1
2017-02-22HouseRead third time
2017-02-21HouseRead second time
2017-02-20HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105514D-H1
2017-02-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2017-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
2017-01-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101071D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
182259.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1091
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1091+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1091H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1091S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1091ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0703+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0096+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0112SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0133SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0189+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0291+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2658+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0914SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0950SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1037SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2806+SB1091

Bill Comments

feedback