VA SB1085 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; motor vehicle noise; report. Directs the Superintendent of State Police to convene a work group to examine the issue of vehicle noise in the Commonwealth and to report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate and House Committees on Transportation by November 1, 2023. Study; motor vehicle noise; report. Directs the Superintendent of State Police to convene a work group to examine the issue of vehicle noise in the Commonwealth and to report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate and House Committees on Transportation by November 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle noise; Department of Transportation shall convene work group to examine issue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-12SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N)
2023-03-27 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2023-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
2023-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1085ER)
2023-03-07SenateEnrolled
2023-02-22SenateTitle replaced 23106902D-H1
2023-02-22SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2023-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N)
2023-02-21HousePassed House with substitute (77-Y 21-N)
2023-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1085H1
2023-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 23106902D-H1
2023-02-21HouseRead third time
2023-02-20HouseRead second time
2023-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 23106902D-H1
2023-02-16HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2023-02-10HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
2023-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1085S1
2023-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105694D-S1
2023-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-03SenateRead second time
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105694D-S1
2023-01-26SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2023-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103884D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621047(n/a)See Bill Text
4621049.1(n/a)See Bill Text
4621165(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1085
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1085+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1085S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1085H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1085ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105603D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/23106902D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB1085AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1085F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1085FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1085FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1085FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S11V0036+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0209+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0212SB1085+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0261SB1085+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1902V0026+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0121+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2117+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0758SB1085+SB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV1056SB1085+SB1085

Bill Comments

feedback