VA SB1084 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly districts; technical adjustments. Changes district assignments of certain Loudoun County census blocks between Senate Districts 13 and 33 and House of Delegates Districts 10, 32, 33, 67, and 87 in order to follow new precinct boundaries. Both Senate districts remain within two percent deviation and all House of Delegates districts remain within one percent deviation from the respective ideal district populations.
Title
General Assembly districts; technical adjustments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1084ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House (77-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-13 | House | Stricken from docket by Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102010D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 303.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 304.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |