VA SB1081 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

COPN; demonstration of public need and compliance with State Medical Facilities Plan. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law or regulation, an application for a certificate of public need for the introduction of a specialty-level neonatal special care service in Planning District 5 that (i) contains in the record testimony of a neonatologist, employed or contracted by an incumbent provider of neonatal special care services in the same planning district, that the proposed number of bassinets in the application is clinically appropriate for the neonatal special care service proposed and would be beneficial to health outcomes of infants born at the applicant's facility and (ii) includes the agreement of the applicant to accept standard charity care conditions on the proposed neonatal special care services shall be deemed to (a) demonstrate a public need for such proposed specialty-level neonatal special care service and (b) be consistent with the State Medical Facilities Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COPN; demonstration of public need and compliance with State Medical Facilities Plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N) (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N)
2020-02-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
2020-02-10SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
2020-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Certificate of Public Need
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105463D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback