VA SB1080 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1080

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Superintendent of Public Instruction; Urban Teacher Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Urban Teacher Fund and Program, to be administered by the Superintendent of Public Instruction, for the purpose of providing grants to persons employed in urban school divisions with teacher shortages who remain employed by the urban school division for a period of at least five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban Teacher Fund and Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseContinued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
2020-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2020-02-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108348D-H1
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105428D

Same As/Similar To

SB1080 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22123.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1080
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1080+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1080H1+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1080F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1080FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04C0137+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0239+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0457SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0520SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0521SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0522SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0523SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0901C0086+SB1080
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H09C0232+SB1080

Bill Comments

feedback