VA SB1080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Revision of Title 55. Creates proposed Title 55.1 (Property and Conveyances) as a revision of existing Title 55 (Property and Conveyances). Proposed Title 55.1 consists of 29 chapters divided into five subtitles: Subtitle I (Property Conveyances), Subtitle II (Real Estate Settlements and Recordation), Subtitle III (Rental Conveyances), Subtitle IV (Common Interest Communities), and Subtitle V (Miscellaneous). The bill organizes the laws in a more logical manner, removes obsolete and duplicative provisions, and improves the structure and clarity of statutes pertaining to real and personal property conveyances, recordation of deeds, rental property, common interest communities, escheats, and unclaimed property. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2019, and is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property & Conveyances; revision of Title 55 to create Title 55.1, pertains to rental property, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to General Laws and Technology
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2018-12-14SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100845D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182324.1(n/a)See Bill Text
321373(n/a)See Bill Text
321374(n/a)See Bill Text
321375(n/a)See Bill Text
451161.311:10(n/a)See Bill Text
451161.311:11(n/a)See Bill Text
451161.311:9(n/a)See Bill Text
5412345(n/a)See Bill Text
5412345.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412354(n/a)See Bill Text
5412354.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412354.5(n/a)See Bill Text
551100(n/a)See Bill Text
5511101(n/a)See Bill Text
5511200(n/a)See Bill Text
5511703(n/a)See Bill Text
5511800(n/a)See Bill Text
5512306(n/a)See Bill Text
5512400(n/a)See Bill Text
5512906(n/a)See Bill Text
551506(n/a)See Bill Text
551600(n/a)See Bill Text
642108.2(n/a)See Bill Text
801130.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801130.13(n/a)See Bill Text
801178.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801178.4(n/a)See Bill Text
801525.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801525.12(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1080
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1080+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0060+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0036+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1080+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0068+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0327+SB1080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3096+SB1080

Bill Comments

feedback