VA SB1079 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0251)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0251)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Flood protection plan. Directs the Department of Conservation and Recreation to regularly update the flood protection plan for the Commonwealth and to make the plan accessible online. This is a recommendation of the Joint Subcommittee to Formulate Recommendations to Address Recurrent Flooding.
Title
Flood protection plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0251) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 251 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1079ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103430D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1817 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)